Financial history SNEYD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1054740
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £297.45k £231.61k £250.93k £234.89k £205.17k
Total expenditure £173.19k £283.21k £204.45k £212.46k £205.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £11.03k N/A N/A