Accounts and annual returns SNEYD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1054740
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 April 2022 67 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window