Financial history EDUCATION OTHERWISE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £11.73k £8.44k £8.90k £5.54k £10.50k
Total expenditure £11.04k £9.19k £7.64k £5.99k £5.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A