ACADEMY FOR CONTEMPORARY CIRCUS AND PHYSICAL THEATRE

Charity number: 1056852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patricia Josephine Min Ying Brown Trustee 08 November 2021 None on record
Bethan Touhig-Gamble Trustee 09 October 2017 None on record
Amy Dalton-Hardy Trustee 11 January 2020 None on record
Lynn Barlow Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
Ann-Marie Leighton Trustee 02 January 2018 None on record
CLAIRE MICHELLE WILLIAMS Trustee 30 June 2014
BACKWELL TODDLER GROUP Received: On time