Trustees UK OVERSEAS TERRITORIES CONSERVATION FORUM

Charity number: 1058483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MICHAEL WILLIAM PIENKOWSKI Chair
None on record
ANDREW JOHN PEARCE Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record
JOAN LORRAINE WALLEY Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record
Alexander John Randall Trustee 19 November 2019
Thin Green Line Foundation UK
Received: On time
THE BAT CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
SARACENS SPORT FOUNDATION
Received: 4 days late
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF BIRDS
Received: On time
HUMAN TRAFFICKING FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PETER BECKINGHAM Trustee 09 July 2018
None on record
KATHLEEN MARY WOOD Trustee 16 September 2015
None on record
NIGEL ROBERT HAYWOOD Trustee 04 November 2014
THE UNITED KINGDOM FALKLAND ISLANDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE FALKLAND ISLANDS TRUST
Recently registered
SARITA VIOLETA FRANCIS Trustee 04 November 2014
None on record
DACE GROUND Trustee
None on record