ST WILFRID'S ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL (YORK) SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1058611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £25.13k £20.42k £14.93k £3.12k £4.47k
Total expenditure £20.39k £25.28k £16.55k £2.30k £5.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A