ST WILFRID'S ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL (YORK) SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1058611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jincy Joseph Trustee 07 February 2019 None on record
SUSAN YZQUIERDO Trustee None on record
Jenny Melbourne Trustee 02 October 2014 None on record
DOMINIC PAISLEY Trustee None on record
Andrew Thompson Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
Father Richard Duffield Trustee 12 February 2014 None on record
RICHARD GEOGHEGAN Trustee 02 October 2014 None on record
Daniel Woolfson Trustee 07 October 2012 None on record
CHRISTOPHER PERRY Trustee None on record
IAN GLEDHILL Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Sarah Kurdziel Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record