Accounts and annual returns CHRIST EMBASSY

Charity number: 1059247
Charity reporting is up to date (269 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2022 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2022 269 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 November 2021 395 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 November 2021 395 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 June 2018 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 June 2018 227 days late Download Open in new window