Financial history CHRIST EMBASSY

Charity number: 1059247
Charity reporting is up to date (269 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.40m £3.09m £4.85m £8.89m £6.86m
Total expenditure £7.53m £8.10m £5.87m £10.78m £5.69m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.12m £3.04m £4.70m £4.75m £5.99m
Income - Other trading activities £1.08m £40.97k £146.19k £140.78k £137.90k
Income - Charitable activities £17.72k £11.38k £10.01k £79 £146
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £34.05k £107 £448 £966 £162
Income - Other £153.92k £0 £0 £4.00m £733.41k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £4.75m £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.23m £8.01m £5.86m £10.77m £5.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.31m £85.14k £15.43k £8.55k £8.52k
Expenditure - Governance £42.01k £16.20k £12.30k £14.40k £13.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £98.27k £265.09k £505.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0