THE ORLANDO CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity number: 1059881
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £17.36k £19.13k £17.11k £16.47k £12.70k
Total expenditure £20.20k £20.06k £14.97k £14.97k £14.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A