Financial history CHURCH OR PARISH LANDS

Charity number: 200711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £7.87k £11.83k £13.99k £9.25k £11.09k
Total expenditure £7.72k £8.68k £12.93k £8.46k £9.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A