Trustees THE UNITED CHARITIES OF ST MARTIN

Charity number: 200733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Peter William Hart Chair 07 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN WITH ST PETER, WORCESTER
Received: On time
THE WORCESTER ST PETER THE GREAT WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF HENRY STAUNTON AND OTHERS
Received: On time
James Carver Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
COUNCILLOR Jo Hodges Trustee 14 June 2019
None on record
LOUIS STEPHEN Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
PAM CLAYTON Trustee 01 August 2013
None on record
COUNCILLOR LYNN DENHAM Trustee 05 June 2013
THE THOMAS CORBETT CHARITY FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED
Received: On time
THE ROYAL ALBERT AND ST SWITHUN'S HOMES
Received: On time
ST SWITHUNS INSTITUTE CHARITY
Received: On time
JABBA RIAZ Trustee 07 July 2011
None on record
BILL SIMPSON Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN WITH ST PETER, WORCESTER
Received: On time
THE WORCESTER ST PETER THE GREAT WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF HENRY STAUNTON AND OTHERS
Received: On time
MR JIM WHELDON Trustee
THE WORCESTER ST PETER THE GREAT WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF HENRY STAUNTON AND OTHERS
Received: On time