TAVISTOCK, WHITCHURCH AND DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION TRUST FUND

Charity number: 200782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required