Financial history ANGIERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 201068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.99k £19.74k £20.86k £20.06k £21.88k
Total expenditure £13.57k £20.40k £16.01k £12.12k £11.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A