Trustees ANGIERS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 201068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Dolton Trustee 27 February 2019
WALLINGFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
John Winters Trustee 13 September 2018
WALLINGFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Mr B Tyrrell Trustee 12 March 2018
WALLINGFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Elisabeth Unsworth Trustee 29 November 2017
WALLINGFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Teresa Harrison Trustee 29 November 2017
None on record
ANDREW ROGERS Trustee 18 May 2016
WALLINGFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ROSSLYN LESTER Trustee 28 June 2013
None on record
Vincent Kerrigan Trustee 13 September 1998
WALLINGFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
PAT HAYTON Trustee
WALLINGFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time