THE THOMAS STAFFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 201628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 February 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 February 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required