THE THOMAS STAFFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 201628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.13k £1.99k £2.03k £2.08k £2.12k
Total expenditure £2.51k £2.32k £3.39k £2.13k £1.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A