Accounts and annual returns WISBECH CHARITIES

Charity number: 204879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window