NORTHAMPTONSHIRE RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 204957
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Wendy Raybould PhD Trustee 05 May 2016 None on record
Neil Brian Lyon MA Trustee 01 January 2013 None on record
JENNY KAY BURT MA Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR EDMUND JOSEPH KING FSA Trustee None on record
Professor Matthew McCormack PhD Trustee 05 October 2019 None on record
Crispin Powell BA DipAA Trustee 04 May 2017 None on record
Dr KEITH BROOKER PHD Trustee None on record
JOHN FORD MBE Trustee
LITTLE HOUGHTON CHARITY Received: On time
THE PHILLIPS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
WARD AND SMYTH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE HERBERT SARGEANT TRUST Received: On time
THE SUMMERHOUSE TRUST Received: On time
RICHARD L PESTELL MA Chair 17 March 2012 None on record
Deborah Hayter MA Trustee 02 May 2015 None on record
Margaret Hawkins MA MSc Trustee 04 May 2017 None on record
Dr N E Karn Trustee 04 October 2014
SUFFOLK RECORDS SOCIETY Received: On time
ROSEMARY EADY Trustee
THE PYTCHLEY CHURCH HERITAGE TRUST Received: On time
WILLIAM AYLWORTH'S ENDOWED SCHOOL Received: On time
Dr TERENCE WATERFIELD PHD Trustee None on record
Lord Boswell of Aynho Trustee 05 May 2015 None on record
Dr SANDRA GILHAM RABAN MA PHD Trustee None on record
DR DAVID NEVILLE HALL FSA MA Trustee
THE WOLLASTON HERITAGE SOCIETY Received: On time