Trustees CHARITY OF JOHN CAREWAY

Charity number: 205143
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Still Trustee 01 June 2022
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
Lucy Allen Trustee 01 March 2022
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
Reginald Douglas Whitehouse Trustee 20 June 2019
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days
Patricia Jayne Newman Trustee 20 June 2017
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days
Lynda Juliet Norden Trustee 16 November 2011
FULBOURN ALMHOUSES CHARITY
Overdue by 123 days
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
Rev ALICE ABIGAIL GOODMAN Trustee 10 June 2011
THE ST NICHOLAS GREAT WILBRAHAM TRUST
Overdue by 31 days
FARMER'S CHARITY
Overdue by 123 days
WESTON'S CHARITY
Overdue by 123 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST VIGOR WITH ALL SAINTS, FULBOURN
Received: On time
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
ANNE WARD (OR WAAD)
Received: On time
THE JAMES BENSTEAD CHARITY
Received: On time
WRIGHT'S CLOCK LAND CIO
Received: On time
Robert Lacey Trustee 30 January 2011
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
Rachael Ruth Kindred Trustee 30 January 2011
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
Adrian Miles Pretto Chaplin Trustee 30 January 2011
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
Philip Christopher Hodgson Trustee
THE CHARITY OF GEOFFREY BISHOP
Overdue by 31 days
THE FULBOURN FOUNDATION OF ELIZABETH MARCH
Overdue by 31 days