ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ALTON, HASLEMERE AND PETERSFIELD BRANCH

Charity number: 205153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Christine Houghton Trustee None on record
John Leston Trustee 04 August 2015 None on record
Diana Fowler Trustee None on record
Laurie Brown Trustee
Godalming Performing Arts Festival Received: On time
Michael Hawker Trustee 04 June 2020 None on record
Vanessa Kemp Chair
THE BETHANY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Delia Andrews Trustee 13 August 2012 None on record
Heather Woodrow Trustee 03 August 2017 None on record
Norman Fowler Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record