ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PLYMOUTH AND SOUTH WEST DEVON BRANCH

Charity number: 205961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time Download