Financial history COMBAT STRESS

Charity number: 206002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.71m £15.77m £16.38m £10.24m £12.23m
Total expenditure £17.05m £15.44m £14.86m £14.61m £12.88m
Income from government contracts £4.47m £4.50m £2.14m £1.57m N/A
Income from government grants £482.00k £121.00k £650.00k £125.00k £458.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.30m £10.31m £13.32m £7.78m £9.14m
Income - Other trading activities £298.00k £330.00k £419.00k £361.00k £213.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.82m £4.85m £2.36m £1.82m £2.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £228.00k £238.00k £251.00k £241.00k £234.00k
Income - Other £67.00k £54.00k £25.00k £40.00k £10.00k
Income - Legacies £2.22m £1.98m £4.20m £1.83m £2.52m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.73m £13.25m £12.42m £11.97m £10.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.32m £2.19m £2.44m £2.64m £1.96m
Expenditure - Governance £177.00k £0 £145.00k £0 £217.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £28.00k £0 £17.00k £15.00k £14.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0