THE BOX MOOR TRUST

Charity number: 206142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £970.34k £911.73k £913.03k £956.34k £941.88k
Total expenditure £940.60k £857.26k £964.17k £892.60k £948.63k
Income from government contracts £79.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £64.62k £81.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £7.87k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £197.89k £103.96k £95.72k £94.47k £76.84k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £772.44k £807.77k £817.31k £854.00k £838.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £26.77k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £715.87k £655.53k £710.06k £689.79k £718.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds £224.74k £201.72k £254.11k £202.81k £229.96k
Expenditure - Governance £83.15k £46.85k £51.38k £46.22k £52.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £33.24k £17.84k £30.38k £27.23k £59.31k
Expenditure - Investment management £224.74k £201.72k £254.11k £202.81k £127.05k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0