Accounts and annual returns BUCKINGHAMSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 206471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 16 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window