Trustees BUCKINGHAMSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 206471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir David Roy Lidington Chair 12 October 2020
INSTITUTE FOR GOVERNMENT
Received: On time
Laurence Peter JOHNSON Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Philip William Hynard Trustee 29 March 2021
ONE CAN TRUST
Received: On time
Countess Elizabeth Helen Howe Trustee 27 November 2020
None on record
Vicky Peel Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Robert Ruck-Keene Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
MARILYNNE MORGAN CB Trustee 20 November 2012
CHARITIES ADMINISTERED ICW THE HONOURABLE SOCIETY OF THE MIDDLE TEMPLE
Received: On time
CAROLINE MARY ASTON Trustee 14 March 2011
THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time
THE RT REVD ATL WILSON Trustee
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
MARY SAUNDERS Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF DORCHESTER ABBEY
Received: On time
THE HON MRS JENEFER ANNE FARNCOMBE Trustee
BEACONSFIELD OLD CHURCH SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
CAROLINE BRIDGET ABEL-SMITH OBE Trustee
None on record
ANDREW FINN-KELCEY Trustee
None on record
MARY ELIZABETH VILLIERS OBE Trustee
None on record