Financial history BUCKINGHAMSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 206471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £74.57k £64.55k £68.61k £168.94k £72.00k
Total expenditure £72.50k £75.56k £58.31k £99.27k £131.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A