ST BARNABAS SOUTHWOLD

Charity number: 206792
Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 82 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 82 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 447 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 447 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2018 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required