ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH ESSEX BRANCH

Charity number: 206799
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £284.84k £253.45k £287.17k £499.62k £411.95k
Total expenditure £268.41k £258.95k £266.10k £362.59k £411.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A