Financial history OXFORD AND ST GEORGE'S JEWISH YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 207191
Charity reporting is overdue by 531 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £90.90k £16.31k £15.66k £14.11k £11.48k
Total expenditure £128.82k £83.77k £111.43k £104.29k £52.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A