Accounts and annual returns CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 207509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required