Financial history CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 207509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £9.99k £9.94k £9.94k £9.97k £11.51k
Total expenditure £9.99k £9.94k £9.94k £9.97k £11.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A