Trustees CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 207509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ELEANOR JANE WILLIAMS Chair 20 June 2011
THE CHARLES WILLIAM HUNT COAL FUND
Received: On time
ST MARY'S BURWELL PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURWELL WITH ST ETHELDREDA AND THE HOLY TRINITY REACH
Received: On time
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Stephen Charles Martin Trustee 21 June 2021
ST MARY'S BURWELL PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURWELL WITH ST ETHELDREDA AND THE HOLY TRINITY REACH
Received: On time
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jeremy Lander Trustee 21 June 2021
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JACQUELINE MAY LUCAS Trustee 07 December 2015
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JACQUELINE JOYCE MORGAN Trustee 19 March 2012
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARY HELEN HAMMOND Trustee 13 December 2011
BURWELL COMMUNITY PRINT CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNETH WILFRED HURRELL Trustee 05 December 2005
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SIMON NEIL OGILVIE Trustee 22 March 1999
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURWELL WITH ST ETHELDREDA AND THE HOLY TRINITY REACH
Received: On time
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROGER RAY LOGAN Trustee 28 September 1998
BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Received: On time