Trustees THE HARDY PLANT SOCIETY
Charity number: 208080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Hales | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jaime Karl Blake | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saul Walker | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Hall | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LYNN FARQUHAR | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Ewan Farquhar | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Eric Scott | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Hackett | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Curtis | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ELIZABETH CLARK | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Senior | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.