Financial history THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ATHENS

Charity number: 208673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £1.53m £1.42m £1.59m £1.49m £1.24m
Total expenditure £1.60m £1.67m £1.61m £1.35m £1.60m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.04m £917.74k £1.08m £1.20m £960.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £268.92k £265.97k £269.35k £135.58k £162.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £225.62k £235.23k £242.54k £158.60k £118.36k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £12.30k £0 £0 £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.50m £1.59m £1.53m £1.28m £1.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £102.26k £79.04k £79.11k £70.45k £85.25k
Expenditure - Governance £84.17k £85.09k £90.70k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0