Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ATHENS

Charity number: 208673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window