Trustees THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ATHENS

Charity number: 208673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Roderick Beaton Chair 08 February 2022
None on record
Sarah Green Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Professor Violetta Hionidou Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Nefeli Piree Iliou Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Dr Colin Macdonald Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Dr J Lesley Fitton Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Dr Anna Moles Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Robert Pitt Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record
Phillipe Camu Trustee 22 October 2019
None on record
Professor Elizabeth James Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Professor William Cavanagh Trustee 05 February 2019
None on record
PROFESSOR ROBIN OSBORNE Trustee 01 April 2017
THE PAST AND PRESENT SOCIETY
Received: On time
PROF DAVID WILLIAM HOLTON Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
SIR ADAM NICHOLAS RIDLEY Trustee
BERLIOZ SESQUICENTENARY COMMITTEE
Received: On time
THE BERLIOZ SOCIETY
Received: On time