THE UNION JACK CLUB

Charity number: 208731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2017 On time Download