Trustees NORTHAMPTON MENCAP

Charity number: 208974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joy Scott Chair 23 February 2016
None on record
Sarah Wilson Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Paul Lockyer Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Revd Canon Cuthbertson Trustee 30 January 2018
None on record
Sandra Boughton Trustee 30 January 2018
None on record
Alan Scott Trustee 31 January 2017
None on record
James Boughton Trustee 10 November 2015
None on record
JONATHON CORNWELL Trustee
None on record