THE NEW CHURCH CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 209126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSEMARY JEAN BYNAM Trustee 28 July 2015 None on record
Susan Margaret Sybil Chesworth Trustee 24 July 2012 None on record
Nigel Kenneth Sutton Trustee 16 June 2016
SWEDENBORG SOCIETY Received: On time
DAVID JOHN THOMAS Trustee None on record
Judith Mary Taylor Trustee 18 June 2014 None on record
Dr GEOFFREY CHARLTON BENTLEY Trustee None on record
Charlotte Ruth Rowlands Trustee 14 May 2020 None on record
CHRISTINE ANN SUTTON Trustee None on record