ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MEDWAY WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 209192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Miriam Sarah Davis Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
David John Frederick Downard Chair 30 May 2017 None on record
Shellie Hyde Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record
VERONICA MITCHELL Trustee
DICKENS' COUNTRY PROTECTION SOCIETY Received: On time
Helen Thomas Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
SARAH FRANCES CAMPBELL Trustee None on record
Maureen Margaret Downard Trustee 22 May 2018 None on record
Lois Stephanie Warren Trustee 30 May 2017 None on record