Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY OF ST MARY AT THE CROSS

Charity number: 209261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 22 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 23 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window