Trustees COMMUNITY OF ST MARY AT THE CROSS

Charity number: 209261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAME MARY THERESE ZELENT Chair
None on record
James Cautley Stewart-Smith Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
JOHN STEPHEN RINGGUTH Trustee 19 October 2017
THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE
Received: On time
Denise Patricia Cooper Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Rev PAUL MICHAEL REECE Trustee 03 July 2012
THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Peter William Wheatley Trustee 07 March 2012
THE NEW ENGLAND COMPANY
Received: On time
CHRIST CHURCH ST LEONARDS OLD BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time
GUYANA DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 1221 days