Financial history COMMUNITY OF ST MARY AT THE CROSS

Charity number: 209261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £1.94m £1.87m £2.14m £2.24m £2.36m
Total expenditure £2.12m £2.15m £2.34m £2.46m £2.72m
Income from government contracts £578.98k £618.17k £774.26k £1.01m £1.07m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £80.47k £30.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £32.47k £10.53k £20.86k £115.74k £29.40k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.29m £1.25m £1.57m £1.67m £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £619.89k £606.42k £543.52k £455.25k £454.91k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £27.31k £5.45k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.04m £2.08m £2.28m £2.41m £2.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £82.06k £76.41k £60.50k £51.86k £57.72k
Expenditure - Governance £23.94k £23.50k £9.36k £10.30k £10.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £82.06k £75.58k £60.50k £51.64k £57.49k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0