THE FRANK PARKINSON AGRICULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 209407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 June 2017 On time Download