THE FRANK PARKINSON AGRICULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 209407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALASTAIR CHARLES MORRISON Trustee 18 April 2012 None on record
DAVID GARDNER Trustee 22 April 2010 None on record
CHRISTOPHER PAUL BOURCHIER Chair 18 September 1999 None on record
Holly Jean Beckett Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL WEBSTER Trustee 01 December 2005
THE WYE RURAL MUSEUM TRUST Received: On time