THE FRANK PARKINSON AGRICULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 209407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £61.13k £64.99k £67.17k £71.17k £71.05k
Total expenditure £42.44k £34.94k £38.45k £50.48k £44.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A