ROYAL ASIATIC SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 209629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £466.25k £611.43k £578.39k £478.31k £412.73k
Total expenditure £480.76k £573.16k £568.14k £516.46k £514.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £28.89k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £41.63k £36.98k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £409.11k £375.13k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £88.62k £90.52k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £72.08k £75.76k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £558.64k £554.09k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £14.52k £14.05k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A