ROYAL ASIATIC SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 209629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Susan Whitfield Trustee 10 May 2018 None on record
Dr BARBARA BREND Trustee 10 May 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Robb Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
Dr DAVID TAYLOR Trustee 10 May 2018
THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR ASIAN AFFAIRS Received: On time
BLOOMSBURY PAKISTAN SOCIAL SCIENCE RESEARCH & ADVOCACY Received: On time
THE AGA KHAN UNIVERSITY (INTERNATIONAL) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM Received: On time
Dr Annabel Teh Gallop Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
DR Jochen Sokoly Trustee 10 May 2018 None on record
Professor Sanjoy Bhattacharya Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Derek Davis Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR SARAH ANSARI Chair 27 May 2021 None on record
Ivan Sedgwick Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Dr Norbert Peabody Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
LIONEL KNIGHT Trustee 12 May 2016 None on record
Francois de Blois Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Dr Helen Elizabeth Driver Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Dr Gordon Johnson Trustee 09 May 2019
THE SIR ERNEST CASSEL EDUCATIONAL TRUST GRANTS TO COMMONWEALTH STUDENTS Received: On time
SIR ERNEST CASSEL EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Dr FIRUZA MELVILLE Trustee 10 May 2018 None on record
Dr Michael Willis Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record
Professor Deborah Swallow Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record