Financial history THE SOLDIERS, SAILORS, AIRMEN AND FAMILIES ASSOCIATION - FORCES HELP

Charity number: 210760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £47.43m £47.36m £44.69m £34.48m £40.24m
Total expenditure £46.55m £46.42m £44.93m £32.89m £29.74m
Income from government contracts £15.47m £16.13m £14.89m £8.80m £6.41m
Income from government grants £1.67m £1.00m £707.00k £895.00k £985.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.25m £11.44m £8.72m £9.91m £10.56m
Income - Other trading activities £4.68m £2.71m £2.79m £1.42m £1.96m
Income - Charitable activities £32.07m £31.86m £30.23m £21.10m £15.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.28m £1.31m £1.66m £1.64m £1.63m
Income - Other £163.00k £35.00k £1.29m £407.00k £10.47m
Income - Legacies £3.30m £4.10m £2.38m £3.21m £4.49m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £41.49m £43.53m £41.77m £30.41m £26.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.06m £2.89m £3.16m £2.48m £3.10m
Expenditure - Governance £260.00k £265.00k £247.00k £187.00k £209.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £85.00k